FL S0338 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Department of Children and Family Services (DCFS) request up to a certain amount in its annual legislative budget request each fiscal year to compensate Angela Sozzani for injuries and damages she sustained as a result of the negligence of employees of the DCFS. Authorizes the department to request additional funds under extraordinary circumstances. Provides for the reversion of funds. Provides that Angela Sozzani's attorneys have represented her pro bono and fees and costs have not been awarded.
Title
Relief/Angela Sozzani/DCFS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 33 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 33 | |
2011-01-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1107 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/338 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0338/BillText/Filed/HTML |