FL S0328 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 743
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 743
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a sheriff to charge a fee for processing a writ of execution. Grants authorized process servers unannounced access to specified residential areas where a defendant or witness resides or is known to be. Authorizes a person attempting to serve process on the registered agent of a corporation to serve the process, in specified circumstances, on any employee of the registered agent during the first attempt at service even if the registered agent is temporarily absent from his or her office, etc.
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 743 | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-29 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 614 | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Regulated Industries -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 33 | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 33 | |
2011-01-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0059 () 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |