FL S0310 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from making a threat to kill or do great bodily injury in a writing or other record and transmitting that threat in any manner that would allow another person to view the threat; deleting requirements that a threat be sent to a specific recipient to be prohibited; exempting certain providers of services from liability, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Threats to Kill or do Great Bodily Injury

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 165
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 165
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2018-03-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 2
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2017-09-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H165 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-128
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback