FL S0306 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing housing discrimination as a cause of action for certain relief and damages stemming from violations of the Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; revising the conditions under which an aggrieved person may commence a civil action in any appropriate court against a specified respondent to enforce specified rights; authorizing, rather than requiring, a civil action to commence within 2 years after an alleged discriminatory housing practice, etc.
Title
Housing Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H853 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/306 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/306/BillText/Filed/HTML |