FL S0306 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for a determination of legal sufficiency relating to an alleged violation of part III of ch. 112, F.S., the Code of Ethics for Public Officers and Employees; providing an exemption from public meetings requirements for any proceeding relating to such determination; authorizing the Commission on Ethics and its staff to share investigative information with criminal investigative agencies; providing for legislative review and repeal of the exemptions under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Meetings/Code of Ethics for Public Officers and Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 31 | |
2011-10-04 | Referred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 31 | |
2011-09-20 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/306 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0306/BillText/Filed/HTML |