FL S0304 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying distribution requirements for certain safe schools allocation funds for the 2020-2021 fiscal year; requiring each district school superintendent to remit specified unused funds from the 2019-2020 fiscal year to the Department of Education; authorizing the department, upon request, to redistribute such funds to certain school districts for a specified purpose, etc.
Title
School Safety Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1167 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/304 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/304/BillText/Filed/HTML |