FL S0296 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that hearsay statements made during certain custodial interrogations comply with specified requirements in order to be admissible; describing circumstances in which an oral, written, or sign-language statement made by an interrogee during a custodial interrogation is presumed inadmissible as evidence against such person unless certain requirements are met; providing for the admissibility of certain statements of an interrogee when made in certain proceedings or when obtained by federal officers or officers from other jurisdictions, etc.
Title
Statements Made by a Criminal Defendant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/21/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0453 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/296 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0296/BillText/Filed/HTML |