FL S0290 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing county legislative and governing bodies to create boards to investigate alleged retaliatory conduct by landlords; authorizing such boards to impose fines for retaliatory conduct by landlords, etc.
Title
Retaliatory Conduct by Landlords
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H603 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/290 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/290/BillText/Filed/HTML |