FL S0290 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting the circumstances in which an abortion may be performed in the third trimester or after viability; requiring a physician who offers to perform or who performs abortions to complete continuing education related to ethics; providing that an infant born alive subsequent to an attempted abortion is entitled to the same rights, powers, and privileges as are granted by the laws of this state; providing that it is a first-degree misdemeanor to unlawfully advertise how to obtain an abortion; prohibiting a person from establishing, conducting, managing, or operating a clinic in this state without a valid and current license issued by the Agency for Health Care Administration; revising the amount of the fine that the Agency for Health Care Administration may impose for a violation of ch. 390, F.S., relating to abortion, or part II of ch. 408, F.S., relating to licensure, etc.
Title
Abortions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-02-23 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/22/12, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/16/12, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 29 | |
2011-10-04 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 29 | |
2011-09-19 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
797 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
797 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/290 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0290/BillText/Filed/HTML |