FL S0290 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the employer retirement contribution for members of the elected officers class.
Title
Retirement for Elected Officials
Sponsors
Sen. Paula Dockery [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 31 | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 31 | |
2010-12-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1139 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/290 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0290/BillText/Filed/HTML |