FL S0288 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Florida Public Service Commission to hold public customer service meetings in certain service territories; requiring a person who lobbies a member of the Florida Public Service Commission Nominating Council to register as a lobbyist; requiring the Governor to remove from office any commissioner found to have willfully and knowingly violated the ex parte communications statute; requiring that money received by a utility for the development of demand-side renewable energy systems be used solely for that purpose, etc.
Title
Utilities Regulation
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities Committee | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7109 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Now in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Original reference(s)- removed: Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | CS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 02/17/15, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0219 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H7109 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
H7109 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
350 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |