FL S0286 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-14)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Florida Slavery Memorial; providing for administration of the memorial by the Department of Management Services; directing the department to develop a specified plan for the design, placement, and cost of the memorial and submit the plan to the Governor and Legislature, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Slavery Memorial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 67
2018-02-21SenateSubstituted HB 67
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-31SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-09-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H67 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-31

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
265006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback