FL S0286 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Florida Slavery Memorial; providing for administration of the memorial by the Department of Management Services; directing the department to develop a specified plan for the design, placement, and cost of the memorial and submit the plan to the Governor and Legislature, etc.
Title
Florida Slavery Memorial
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 67 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substituted HB 67 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2018-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H67 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-31
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/286 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/286/BillText/Filed/HTML |