FL S0286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Concrete Masonry Education Act"; creating the Florida Concrete Masonry Education Council, Inc.; requiring the council to operate under a written contract with the Department of Economic Opportunity; authorizing the council to accept grants, donations, contributions, and gifts under certain circumstances; providing for collection of a voluntary assessment on concrete masonry units; requiring manufacturers who elect to pay the assessment to commit to paying the assessment for a specified period, etc.
Title
Concrete Masonry Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#815 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-175 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 147 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Received |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-25 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (577134) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/03/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/13/14, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/08/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0147 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 286 (Ch. 2014-175)