FL S0286 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing from a third-degree felony to a second-degree felony the penalty imposed for willfully failing to remain at the scene of a crash involving personal injury; conforming provisions of the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, etc.
Title
Vehicle Crashes Resulting in Personal Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 29 | |
2011-11-02 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-01 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-10-21 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/01/11, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-10-04 | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 29 | |
2011-09-19 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/286 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0286/BillText/Filed/HTML |