FL S0284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for the bylaws of the Florida High School Athletic Association governing student eligibility to participate in interscholastic athletic competition to mandate that the required medical evaluation include an electrocardiogram; revising the information that must be included on the preparticipation physical evaluation form, etc.
Title
Student Eligibility for Interscholastic Athletic Competition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Education |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Health Policy |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0533 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/284 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0284/BillText/Filed/HTML |