FL S0280 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring advertising platforms to collect and remit specified taxes for certain vacation rental transactions; defining the term "advertising platform"; adding licensing to the regulated activities of public lodging establishments and public food service establishments which are preempted to the state; requiring advertising platforms to require that persons placing advertisements or listings for vacation rentals include certain information in the advertisements or listings and attest to certain information; authorizing the division to revoke, refuse to issue or renew, or suspend vacation rental licenses under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01HouseIn Messages
2024-02-01SenateImmediately certified
2024-02-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
2024-02-01SenateRead 3rd time
2024-02-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (408426, 537920)
2024-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2024-01-25SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2024-01-24SenateCS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2024-01-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/25/24
2024-01-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-01-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-18SenateCS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2024-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/18/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-12-13SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2023-12-13SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2023-12-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/13/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
2023-11-30SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Fiscal Policy
2023-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1537 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/711870/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/222178/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/440448/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/696386/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/657364/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/386980/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/537920/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Amendment/408426/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Analyses/2024s00280.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Analyses/2024s00280.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Analyses/2024s00280.pre.fp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Analyses/2024s00280.fp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Vote/2023-12-13%200830AM~S00280%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Vote/2024-01-18%200130PM~S00280%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/280/Vote/SenateVote_s00280c1004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback