FL S0280 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the standard of care for telehealth providers; providing that telehealth providers, under certain circumstances, are not required to research a patient's history or conduct physical examinations before providing services through telehealth; providing recordkeeping requirements for telehealth providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-03-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (883158)
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Health Policy
2018-01-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-09-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H793 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270915Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback