FL S0274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 53 (Ch. 2014-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 53 (Ch. 2014-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Waiving the fees for identification cards and replacement driver licenses issued to certain inmates; requiring a waiver of fees for certain inmates receiving a copy of a birth certificate; requiring the Department of Corrections to work with other agencies in acquiring necessary documents for certain inmates to acquire an identification card before release; providing exceptions; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to issue a temporary permit under certain circumstances; authorizing the department to operate male and female faith- and character-based institutions, etc.
Title
Inmate Reentry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 53 (Ch. 2014-193) |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 53 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/06/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-12-09 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/09/13, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0043 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 53 (Ch. 2014-193)
H0053 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-193
H0053 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-193
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |