FL S0274 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2013-85)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2013-85)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a Freemasonry license plate; establishing an annual use fee for the plate; providing for the distribution of annual use fees received from the sale of such plates, etc.
Title
Freemasonry License Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] | Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Rules Committee |
Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Charles Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2013-85) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 487 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/17/13, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2013-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/13, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Rules; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0487 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-85
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |