FL S0270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a designated law enforcement agency to decline to transport a minor 14 years of age or younger to a receiving facility for mental health or substance abuse evaluation if the parent or guardian of the minor agrees to transport the minor to the receiving facility; requiring an assessment by a service provider of a minor 14 years of age or younger to be initiated within 8 hours after the patient's arrival at the receiving facility, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary Examination and Involuntary Admission of Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-01-29SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2017-09-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H947 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Placed on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3944599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback