FL S0250 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that a petition for compensation describe the existence of clear and convincing evidence of actual innocence. Requires the petitioner to submit fingerprints for criminal history records checks. Provides for compensation of reasonable attorney's fees and expenses, up to $50,000, incurred for pursuing compensation for wrongful incarceration. Precludes submission of an application for compensation if the wrongfully incarcerated person has received a prior favorable judgment from a civil action arising out of the wrongful incarceration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compensation for Wrongful Incarceration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 28
2011-01-05 Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 29
2010-12-13 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
96102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96106Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback