FL S0246 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising penalties for violations of the Florida Ban on Texting While Driving Law; providing enhanced penalties for such violations when committed in a school zone or school crossing, etc.
Title
Texting While Driving in a School Zone
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Fiscal Policy |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0025 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/246 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0246/BillText/Filed/HTML |