FL S0238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a postsecondary educational institution include a notation on a student's academic transcript if the student has been dismissed from the institution for a sexual misconduct offense; requiring that institutions adopt procedures for removing a notation from a student's academic transcript under certain circumstances; specifying a requirement for the notation delineating a sexual misconduct offense on a student's academic transcript, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Misconduct

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Education; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-01-04SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004098Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback