FL S0236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read 2nd time -SJ 628, 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read 2nd time -SJ 628, 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the parents of certain deceased veterans and the spouse and parents of law enforcement officers and firefighters who die in the line of duty to receive annual entrance passes to state parks at no charge. Designates the Jack Mashburn Marina at St. Andrews State Park in Bay County. Exempts parks within the state park system which have free-roaming animal populations from certain liability provisions. Provides for certain municipalities to use the proceeds of the surcharge for land acquisition or beach renourishment or restoration, etc.
Title
State Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 628, 647 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Withdrawn from Budget with subcommittee recommendation -SJ 540 | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 474 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-08 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 473 | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Budget -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-25 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-11 | Now in Environmental Preservation and Conservation -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-10 | Favorable by Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 27 | |
2011-03-07 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/10/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 27 | |
2010-12-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0095 () 2011-05-04 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (748168) -HJ 1143
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
258 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0685 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
588 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |