FL S0232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 188 (Ch. 2014-41)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 188 (Ch. 2014-41)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a school district or school from collecting a student's biometric information, etc.
Title
Biometric Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 188 (Ch. 2014-41) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0195 (Similar To) 2014-04-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 188 (Ch. 2014-41)
S0188 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-41
S0188 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/232 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0232/BillText/Filed/HTML |