FL S0230 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Florida Security and Immigration Compliance Act." Prohibits agencies from entering into a contract for contractual services with contractors that are not registered and participating by a specified date in a federal work-authorization program. Provides procedures with respect to verification of eligibility for benefits, etc.
Title
Enforcement of Immigration Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 27 | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 27 | |
2010-12-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0271 () 2011-01-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 29
S1896 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1896 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/230 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0230/BillText/Filed/HTML |