FL S0226 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Care for Retired Police Dogs Program Act"; creating the Care for Retired Police Dogs Program within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the department to contract with a nonprofit corporation to administer and manage the program; specifying requirements for the disbursement of funds for the veterinary care of eligible retired police dogs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care for Retired Police Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#821 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08SenateOrdered enrolled
2022-03-08HouseCS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2022-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2022-03-07HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2022-03-07HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2022-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2022-03-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-03-04HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
2022-03-04HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2022-03-01HouseIn Messages
2022-03-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2022-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2022-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2022-02-28SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2022-02-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
2022-02-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-02-25SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-02-24SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2022-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-12-02SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-12-01SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/01/21, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-11-02SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2021-11-02SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-10-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/02/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-09-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2021-09-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H25 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 226

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94369Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Amendment/689614/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Amendment/675938/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.pre.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.acj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Analyses/2022s00226.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Vote/2021-11-02%201230PM~S00226%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Vote/2021-12-01%200430PM~S00226%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Vote/2022-02-24%200900AM~S00226%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Vote/SenateVote_s00226c1023.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/226/Vote/HouseVote_s00226c1821.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback