FL S0226 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "athletic trainer"; requiring certain licensees to maintain certification in good standing without lapse as a condition of renewal of their athletic trainer licenses; requiring that an athletic trainer work within a specified scope of practice; requiring the direct supervision of an athletic training student to be in accordance with rules adopted by the Board of Athletic Training, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Athletic Trainers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#667 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Chapter No. 2020-29
2020-06-18 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-26HouseIn Messages
2020-02-19SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-02-19SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/20
2020-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-05SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/05/20, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-23SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-23SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/23/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-24SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-10-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-10-22SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-10-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/22/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2019-09-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H485 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 226 passed
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
468701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468723Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback