FL S0226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises dates relating to the presidential preference primary.
Title
Presidential Preference Primary [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations -SJ 00025 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |