FL S0224 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing the designations of the birthdays of Robert E. Lee and Jefferson Davis and Confederate Memorial Day as legal holidays, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal Holidays

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-06SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S214 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H277 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
68301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback