FL S0212 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising definitions of the terms "edibles," "low-THC cannabis," "marijuana," and "marijuana delivery device" to include items that are dispensed by a medical marijuana retail facility; prohibiting qualified physicians and caregivers from being employed by or having an economic interest in a medical marijuana retail facility; revising provisions to authorize medical marijuana retail facilities to dispense marijuana, marijuana delivery devices, and edibles under certain conditions; providing operational and dispensing requirements and prohibitions for medical marijuana retail facilities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Retail Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
2019-08-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S210 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H797 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381987Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback