FL S0212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from entering or being present in this state if he or she has been denied admission, excluded, deported, or removed from the United States unless the United States Attorney General consents to his or her admission or the person can establish that federal law does not require advance consent, etc.
Title
Reentry Into the State by Certain Persons
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H45 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/212 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/212/BillText/Filed/HTML |