FL S0206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Electronic Wills Act"; specifying requirements that must be satisfied in the execution of electronic wills; authorizing an electronic will of a nonresident of this state which is properly executed in this or another state to be offered for and admitted to probate in this state; requiring a qualified custodian to post and maintain a blanket surety bond, subject to certain
Title
Wills and Trusts
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] |
Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 277 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time 552 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (311744, 574270, 599332) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2016-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0277 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
H481 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
H1379 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-155
S1554 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
S1626 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
H481 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
H1379 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-155
S1554 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
S1626 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1379 (Ch. 2017-155)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
731 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 527 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 528 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 529 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
733 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 04117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 08135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |