FL S0192 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying conditions under which members of any board or commission of any state agency or authority or of any agency or authority of any county, municipal corporation, or political subdivision may participate in fact-finding exercises or excursions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-24SenateNow in Rules
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 10/24/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-10-11SenateNow in Community Affairs
2017-10-10SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 10/10/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H79 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
286011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback