FL S0184 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an adolescent offender who was 15 years of age or younger at the time of commission of an offense and who is sentenced to life or a single or cumulative term of 10 years or more in prison is eligible for parole if the offender has been incarcerated for a minimum period and has not previously been convicted of or adjudicated delinquent for certain offenses. Provides for retroactive application, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adolescent Offenders/Parole [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died on Calendar
2010-04-23 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00552
2010-04-14 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-13 CS/CS by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00554
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 37-S
2010-03-15 Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00190
2010-03-10 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-09 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00234
2010-03-04 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00022
2009-12-09 Referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
2009-10-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0023 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
094716Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback