FL S0182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting, under specified circumstances, changes to a health insurance policy prescription drug formulary during a policy year; requiring small employer carriers to limit changes to prescription drug formularies under certain circumstances; limiting, under specified circumstances, changes to a health maintenance contract prescription drug formulary during a contract year, etc.
Title
Consumer Protection from Nonmedical Changes to Prescription Drug Formularies
Sponsors
Senate Health Policy Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/21/17, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/07/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0095 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |