FL S0174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the task force within the Department of Law Enforcement; specifying membership of the task force; authorizing reimbursement for per diem and travel expenses; prescribing duties of the task force; requiring the task force to submit a report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date; providing for expiration of the task force; providing for staffing, etc.
Title
Cold Case Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0564 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/174 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0174/BillText/Filed/HTML |