FL S0174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Read 2nd time -SJ 298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reenacts provisions relating to the definition of "urban service area" and "dense urban land area" for purposes of the Local Government Comprehensive Planning and Land Development Regulation Act. Reenacts provisions relating to certain required and optional elements of a comprehensive plan, concurrency requirements for transportation facilities, a required notice for a new or increased impact fee, the process for adopting a comprehensive plan or plan amendment, etc.
Title
Growth Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 298 | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/11 | |
2011-03-23 | Retained on Calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/11 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 17 NAYS 3 -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-10 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/15/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 23 | |
2011-02-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-08 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/08/11, 11:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-11 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-03 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/11/11, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2010-12-16 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 23 | |
2010-12-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7001 () 2011-04-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 447
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 31801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 32465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
171 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/174 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0174/BillText/Filed/HTML |