FL S0160 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting a rural letter carrier of the United States Postal Service from safety belt usage requirements while performing his or her duties on a designated postal route, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Letter Carriers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#209 (Y: 88 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-81
2015-05-22 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 88 NAYS 28
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 409
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-08HouseIn Messages
2015-04-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2015-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-23SenateCS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2015-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-20SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-19SenateCS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-04SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-02-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2015-02-05SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/05/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2014-12-17SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2014-12-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0409 (Similar To) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2015-81)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback