FL S0146 | 2018 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Designating this act as the "Pro Bono Matters Act of 2018"; requiring the payment of due process costs of litigation of all pro bono attorneys appointed to represent dependent children with certain special needs, subject to appropriations and review for reasonableness, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Appointment of Attorneys for Dependent Children with Special Needs


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#610 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-14
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-20SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-14HouseSubstituted for HB 57
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/11/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-12-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

H57 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 146

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3901305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments