FL S0142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "contract"; extending the period of time for which a health care provider remains an agent of the state after an individual under his or her care is deemed ineligible; requiring that a contract with a governmental contractor for health care services include a provision allowing a voluntary contribution toward certain dental laboratory work; prohibiting the contribution from exceeding the actual amount of the dental laboratory charges; delaying the future repeal of provisions authorizing the health access dental license, etc.
Title
Access to Health Care for the Underserved
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted HB 97 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/06/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/14/14, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-09-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/08/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0097 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-108
S0710 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
H0869 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on PPACA, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
S0664 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
S0710 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
H0869 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on PPACA, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
S0664 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
466 | 00673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |