FL S0138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2013-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2013-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Abrogating the future repeal of certain provisions relating to the compact; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the compact, etc. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Dean [R] | Sen. Lizbeth Benacquisto [R] | Senate Appropriations Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2013-20) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7003 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/19/13 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/13, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/05/13, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Now in Education |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/23/13, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Education; Appropriations |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7003 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-20
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |