FL S0124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation may authorize advance deposit wagering conducted by certain permitholders or certain operators contracting with a permitholder; specifying requirements for a person authorized to conduct advance deposit wagering; prohibiting a resident or other individual from placing a wager through an advance deposit wagering system under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Advance Deposit Wagering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/124 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0124/BillText/Filed/HTML |