FL S0124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Corrections to electronically monitor a person who is sentenced to probation or community control.
Title
Probation and Community Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 20 | |
2010-11-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary -SJ 20 | |
2010-11-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/124 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0124/BillText/Filed/HTML |