FL S0122 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Modifying and clarifying the schedule governing campaign finance reporting for candidates, political committees, and electioneering communications organizations; prohibiting a political committee or an electioneering communications organization from transferring funds to certain entities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H43 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
S1276 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1060703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10638Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback