FL S0118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a participating business that registers with the Department of Revenue to solicit and collect contributions from its customers for the construction and maintenance of public education facilities; requiring the department to issue a certificate and taxpayer identification number to a participating business; providing that contributions become state funds at the moment of collection by a participating business; including voluntary contributions as a source of funding for the Public Education Capital Outlay and Debt Service Trust Fund, etc.
Title
Voluntary Contributions for Public Education Facilities
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Messages |
2015-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/16/15, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/02/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0037 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |