FL S0118 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-09 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-09 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to repeal all taxes on income and enact a national retail sales tax as specified in H.R. 25, the Fair Tax Act of 2013, etc.
Title
National Retail Sales Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-09 | House | Substituted for HM 15 |
2014-04-07 | House | Received |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-03-26 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/09/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-08-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0015 (Same As) 2014-04-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SM 118 (Adopted)