FL S0116 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the submission of a written declaration to establish that an elector is a freeholder and qualified to vote in an election or referendum limited to freeholders who are qualified to vote, etc.
Title
Freeholder Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1122 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 958 | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 1158 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1158 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1116 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1098 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1098 | |
2012-02-10 | In Messages | |
2012-02-08 | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 321 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/12 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/01/12, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-20 | Now in Budget -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 01/19/12, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections read 1st time -SJ 99 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 18 | |
2011-12-06 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2011-12-06 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 110 | |
2011-11-17 | Now in Budget -SJ 110 | |
2011-11-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-16 | Favorable by Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 110 | |
2011-11-07 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 11/16/11, 11:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-10-05 | Now in Rules -SJ 112 | |
2011-10-05 | CS by Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-09-26 | On Committee agenda-- Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections, 10/05/11, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules; Budget -SJ 18 | |
2011-08-29 | Filed |