FL S0108 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Kidcare Operational Efficiency and Health Care Improvement Workgroup as a task force administratively housed in the Department of Health to maximize the return on investment and enhance the operational efficiencies of the Florida Kidcare program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Kidcare Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-01-19SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-10SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-10-09SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 09/12/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H293 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - Now in Health and Human Services Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback